CA AJR10 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school-based health centers.
Title
School-based health centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR10 Brownley By Hancock (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - AJR 10 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - AJR 10 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-14 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1849.) | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-03 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-02 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 1166.) | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-31 | From printer. | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced. To print. |