CA AJR1 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Kalra.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to immigration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolition of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-05AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Kalra.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13).
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-12-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback