CA AJR1 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to natural catastrophes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earthquake damage: mitigation planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent Cal AJR1 Blakeslee (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AJR1 BLAKESLEE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2009.
2009-07-02 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2009-06-26 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2009-06-26 Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1492.)
2009-06-25 Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-05-14 In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2009-05-14 Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1472.)
2009-05-12 Amended. To Consent Calendar.
2009-05-11 From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
2009-04-27 Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2009-04-23 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Amended.
2009-04-22 In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
2009-02-05 Referred to Com. on INS.
2009-01-23 From printer.
2009-01-22 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ajr_1&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20090122_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20090423_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20090512_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20090628_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20090702_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20090506_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20090514_1123AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20090626_0226PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback