CA ACR99 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-26-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-26-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Salvadoran American Day.
Title
Salvadoran American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR99 Lopez By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2568.) |
2015-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2568.) |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |