CA ACR97 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Officer Phia Vang Memorial Interchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Officer Phia Vang Memorial Interchange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent ACR97 Patterson By Borgeas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Assembly - ACR 97 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.)
2020-08-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-07-11SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-07-11AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.)
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8).
2019-07-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-05-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback