CA ACR96 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-16-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference.

Sponsors

Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]
Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-07SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-09-03AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15).
2021-07-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-07-02AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-07-01AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback