CA ACR96 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 2019 International Day of Yoga.
Title
The 2019 International Day of Yoga.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] |
Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent ACR96 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - ACR 96 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - ACR 96 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1680.) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |