CA ACR95 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Secure Your Load Day.
Title
Secure Your Load Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - ACR 95 Choi Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR95 Choi et al. By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR95 Choi et al. By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-07-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:30 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2567.). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1874.) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2219.) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |