CA ACR92 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-18)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Los Angeles County Sheriff’s Deputy Hagop “Jake” Kuredjian Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles County Sheriff’s Deputy Hagop “Jake” Kuredjian Memorial Highway.

Sponsors

Asm. Pilar Schiavo [D]Asm. Dawn Addis [D]Asm. Juan Alanis [R]Asm. David Alvarez [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Jasmeet Bains [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Damon Connolly [D]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Diane Dixon [R]Asm. Bill Essayli [R]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matt Haney [D]Asm. Gregg Hart [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Josh Hoover [R]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Corey Jackson [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Joe Patterson [R]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Juan Carrillo [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Mike Fong [D]Asm. Liz Ortega [D]
Asm. Blanca Pacheco [D]Asm. Diane Papan [D]Asm. Gail Pellerin [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Kate Sanchez [R]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Esmeralda Soria [D]
Asm. Tri Ta [R]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Avelino Valencia [D]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Greg Wallis [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Lori Wilson [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]Asm. Rick Zbur [D]

Roll Calls

2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR92 Schiavo et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Assembly - ACR 92 Schiavo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2024.
2024-04-30 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2024-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2024-04-25SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3774.)
2024-04-25SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2024-04-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2024-04-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2024-04-10SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-08-23SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-08-15SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2023-08-14AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2682.)
2023-08-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5).
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-06-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2023-06-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback