CA ACR91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-23)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Motorcycle Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycle Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Juan Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR91 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-06-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-06-08SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2017-06-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-06-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1648.)
2017-05-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2017-05-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-05-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback