CA ACR9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-17)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Introduced measure version corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to India Republic Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

India Republic Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Sen. Jim Beall [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced measure version corrected.
2019-02-06SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-01-28SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-01-24AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2019-01-24AssemblyCoauthors Revised.
2019-01-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 17).
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback