CA ACR9 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-19)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-19)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Pet Care Education Month.
Title
Pet Care Education Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR9 McCarty By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2994.) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3427.) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 7). |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |