CA ACR87 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-19)
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 9 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 1200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Apr 9 @ 1:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 1200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the “Surf City USA” interchange.
Title
“Surf City USA” interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Assembly - ACR 87 Ta Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2681.) |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |