CA ACR87 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-17 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-17 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Title
Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-01-13 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3499.) | |
2012-01-10 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 9). | |
2012-01-06 | From printer. | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced. To print. |