CA ACR86 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to animals.
Title
Animals: overpopulation: spay and neutering services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Assembly - ACR 86 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR86 Kalra et al. By Eggman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Assembly - ACR 86 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR86 Kalra et al. By Eggman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Assembly - ACR 86 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-04-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.). |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3326.) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2023-07-03 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2538.) |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |