CA ACR86 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Asian and Pacific Islander American Mental Health Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asian and Pacific Islander American Mental Health Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR86 Chau et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-05-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1281.)
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-11AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1481.)
2017-05-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2017-05-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-04AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-05-03AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback