CA ACR85 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Ramadan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ramadan.

Sponsors

Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Sen. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR85 Reyes et al. By Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-06-03SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1400.)
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-05-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1634.)
2019-05-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2019-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-02AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-05-01AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback