CA ACR84 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-23)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Hepatitis Awareness Month and Hepatitis Testing Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hepatitis Awareness Month and Hepatitis Testing Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR84 Gipson et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-05-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1281.)
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-16SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1537.)
2017-05-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 1511.)
2017-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2017-05-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-05-04AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-05-03AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback