CA ACR84 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Officer Joe Mata and Officer Roberto C. Sanchez Memorial Highway.
Title
Officer Joe Mata and Officer Roberto C. Sanchez Memorial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |