CA ACR81 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-10 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-10 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Senior Fraud Awareness Day.
Title
Senior Fraud Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - ACR 81 MITCHELL Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3149.) |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 6). |
2013-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-08-28 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |