CA ACR8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Restorative Practices in School Awareness Month.
Title
Restorative Practices in School Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - ACR 8 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - ACR 8 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 747.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 778.) |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |