CA ACR79 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-22)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-22)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Blue Star Mothers of America Month.
Title
Blue Star Mothers of America Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR79 Salas et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1281.) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1524.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |