CA ACR77 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-18-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Sea Level Rise Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sea Level Rise Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR77 Bennett et al. By Allen (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - ACR 77 Bennett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-02AssemblyAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.)
2021-05-26SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-19SenateMeasure version as revised on May 13 corrected.
2021-05-17SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-05-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1412.)
2021-05-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2021-05-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-27AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-04-26AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback