CA ACR76 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Officer Keith Boyer Memorial Highway.
Title
Officer Keith Boyer Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-28 - Assembly - ACR 76 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR76 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 76 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR76 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - ACR 76 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2792.). |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2231.) |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1548.) |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |