CA ACR75 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-24)
Status: Passed on September 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-24)
Status: Passed on September 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to promotores and community health workers.
Title
Promotores and community health workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR75 V. Manuel Perez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2009-09-12 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2389.) | |
2009-08-31 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-08-27 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2745.) | |
2009-08-20 | From inactive file. To third reading. | |
2009-07-09 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member V. Manuel Perez. | |
2009-07-07 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 30). | |
2009-05-28 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-20 | From printer. | |
2009-05-19 | Introduced. To print. |