CA ACR74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-20)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asian and Pacific Islander American Heritage Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent ACR74 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-04AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2019-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-05-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1384.)
2019-05-28SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-05-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1611.)
2019-05-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2019-04-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-23AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback