CA ACR73 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Celiac Disease Awareness Month.
Title
Celiac Disease Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # ACR73 Baker (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4151.) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4761.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |