CA ACR72 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to American Stroke Month.
Title
American Stroke Month.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 ACR72 Gipson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - ACR 72 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - ACR 72 GIPSON Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1792.) |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1974.) |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |