CA ACR7 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-29)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-29)
Status: Passed on July 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Title
Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent Cal ACR7 Swanson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-01-15 - Assembly - ACR7 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-01-15 - Assembly - ACR7 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-07-02 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2009-06-26 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-26 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1492.) | |
2009-06-25 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-01-22 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-01-15 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 185.) (Corrected January 26.) | |
2009-01-07 | From printer. | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced. To print. |