CA ACR68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Girls on the Run of Greater Sacramento Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Special Consent ACR68 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2019.
2019-05-22AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-05-16SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1060.)
2019-05-13SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-04-29AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1396.)
2019-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2019-04-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback