CA ACR68 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Breast Cancer Awareness and Prevention Month.
Title
Breast Cancer Awareness and Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #8 ACR68 Steinorth By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.) |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2423.) |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |