CA ACR68 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-25)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-25)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Italian American Legislator Project.
Title
Italian American Heritage in California.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR68 Portantino By La Malfa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-22 | In Senate. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2006.) | |
2011-08-22 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2479.) | |
2011-08-15 | Read and amended. (Page 2387.) | |
2011-07-14 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). | |
2011-07-13 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |
2011-06-27 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-09 | From printer. | |
2011-06-08 | Introduced. To print. |