CA ACR65 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-24)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to distracted driving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distracted Driving Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR65 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-05-26SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1224.)
2017-05-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-10SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-04-27AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1268.)
2017-04-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2017-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-04-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback