CA ACR64 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-23)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Special Olympics Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Olympics Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Special Consent ACR64 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-06-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-06-08SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1464.)
2017-06-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-06-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1637.)
2017-05-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-04AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-04-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback