CA ACR62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-22-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-22-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to 5G wireless networks.
Title
5G wireless network technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent ACR62 Quirk et al. By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1532.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |