CA ACR6 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-23)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-23)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to human trafficking.
Title
Human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR6 Donnelly By La Malfa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-03-11 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-03-07 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 296.) | |
2011-02-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-01-25 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-24 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 18). | |
2011-01-13 | From printer. | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced. To print. |