CA ACR6 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - Re-referred to Com. on RULES. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 579.)
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - Re-referred to Com. on RULES. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 579.)
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Dalai Lama and Tibet Awareness Day.
Title
Tibet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-16 - Assembly - ACR6 BLAKESLEE Assembly Third Reading Re-refer to Committee By TORRICO (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, as amended, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 579.) | |
2009-03-09 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (March 2). | |
2008-12-05 | From printer. | |
2008-12-04 | Introduced. To print. |