CA ACR55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 150th Anniversary of the Chinese Massacre of 1871.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The 150th Anniversary of the Chinese Massacre of 1871.

Sponsors

Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Sen. Dave Min [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent ACR55 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2021.
2021-06-11 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2021-06-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-06-01SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-05-28SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-05-11SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-05-10AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1362.)
2021-05-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-23AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback