CA ACR54 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-22-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-22-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Nonprofits Day.
Title
California Nonprofits Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR54 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.) |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2346.) |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |