CA ACR53 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Financial Fitness Month.
Title
Financial Fitness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # ACR53 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1075.) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1189.) |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |