CA ACR50 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-20)
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-20)
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to "Parks Make Life Better!" Month.
Title
Parks Make Life Better! Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR50 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1690.) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1991.) |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |