CA ACR5 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-28)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-28)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Science Education Month.
Title
California Science Education Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-16 - Assembly - ACR5 TORLAKSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR5 Torlakson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR5 Torlakson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-03-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2009-03-16 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 578.) | |
2009-03-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-03-12 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 286.) | |
2009-03-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-03 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-02 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 488.) | |
2009-02-23 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 23). | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2008-12-04 | From printer. | |
2008-12-03 | Introduced. To print. |