CA ACR49 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-24)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-24)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Foster Care Month.
Title
Foster Care Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Special Consent Cal ACR49 Stone (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 949.) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1261.) |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |