CA ACR48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-11-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-11-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women’s Military History Week.
Title
Women Warriors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR48 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - ACR 48 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - ACR 48 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 747.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 778.) |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |