CA ACR47 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Staff Sergeant Robert Scott Johnson Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Staff Sergeant Robert Scott Johnson Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - ACR 47 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent ACR47 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - ACR 47 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-08-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.)
2021-08-19SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-15SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1033.)
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12).
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback