CA ACR45 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-29)
Status: Passed on September 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]


Relative to the Ukrainian Famine of 1932-1933.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Ukrainian Famine of 1932-1933.


Asm. Shannon Grove [R]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Beth Gaines [R]Asm. Mike Gatto [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Kristin Olsen [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Donald Wagner [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. K H Achadjian [R]
Asm. Luis Alejo [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Juan Arambula [D]Asm. Toni Atkins [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Susan Bonilla [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Cheryl Brown [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Nora Campos [D]Asm. Ling-ling Chang [R]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Richard Gordon [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. David Hadley [R]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Brian Jones [R]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Young Kim [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Eric Linder [R]
Asm. Patty Lopez [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Das Williams [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]
Sen. Mark Leno [D]

Roll Calls

2016-08-29 - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR45 Grove By Nielsen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Be referred to Committee on Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2016-09-07AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2016-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2016-08-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5486.)
2016-08-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-19SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2016-08-18AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5855.)
2016-08-01AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 1).
2016-06-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-06-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2016-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-04-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2016-04-13AssemblyMeasure version as amended on April 11 corrected.
2016-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Amended.
2015-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-03-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2015-03-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call

Bill Comments