CA ACR45 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-31)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-31)
Status: Passed on May 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Week.
Title
California Holocaust Memorial Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR45 Ruskin (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 900.) | |
2009-04-28 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-27 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1099.) | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |
2009-04-01 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. (Corrected April 1.) (Corrected April 3.) | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-05 | From printer. | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced. To print. |