CA ACR42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-22-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-22-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Jackie Robinson.
Title
Jackie Robinson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR42 Holden et al. By Bradford (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 909.) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 964.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |