CA ACR40 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-21-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state budget.
Title
Legislature: state budget: zero-based budgeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - ACR 40 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1590.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 26. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |