CA ACR39 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to drowning prevention.
Title
Roxie’s Wish: Drowning Prevention Week for Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent ACR39 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - ACR 39 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - ACR 39 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-05-03 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 931.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |